Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Laurentz Studach

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sweden

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1796Born
13 Feb 182023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
10 Aug 183337.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sweden
22 May 186265.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
1 Jun 186265.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
9 May 187376.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Sweden

MicroData Summary for Jakob Laurentz Studach (VIAF: 69705593)
Bishop Jakob Laurentz Studach (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sweden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltstetten, Switzerland
Ordained BishopMaria del anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017