Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Spiridione Maddalena

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1824Born
4 Jun 185025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Corf¨, Greece
28 Sep 186035.9AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
9 Dec 186036.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1 Aug 188459.7DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

MicroData Summary for Spiridione Maddalena (VIAF: 305042631)
Archbishop Spiridione Maddalena (born , died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu, Archdiocese of Corf¨
Ordained BishopCollege of the Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1860, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017