Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Salandri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Marcopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1822Born
6 Jun 184624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Apr 186442.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
22 Apr 186442.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
24 Jul 186442.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
29 Dec 187351.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Salandri (VIAF: 89410547)
Bishop Giuseppe Salandri O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoreto, Diocese of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017