Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bagalà Blasini

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1803Born
12 May 186865.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Livorno, Italy
12 May 186865.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
31 May 186865.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
3 Apr 187672.9AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
1 Mar 188480.9DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bagalà Blasini (VIAF: 88701645)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bagalà Blasini (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivorno, Diocese of Livorno
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentines, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast