Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Rosati

Deceased

Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1807Born
18 Sep 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186759.5AppointedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
22 Apr 186759.6Ordained BishopBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
5 Sep 188174.0DiedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rosati
Bishop Giuseppe Rosati (born , died ) Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017