Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Bindi

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1812Born
4 Apr 183522.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186754.4AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
22 Apr 186754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
27 Oct 187159.0AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
23 Jun 187663.7DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Bindi (VIAF: 12695044)
Archbishop Enrico Bindi (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanapale, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017