Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Pucci-Sisti

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1812Born
21 Apr 183220.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187260.1AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
30 May 187967.3DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Pucci-Sisti (VIAF: 89400907)
Bishop Raffaele Pucci-Sisti (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino, Archdiocese of Urbino
Ordained BishopSiena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017