Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Scotti

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1832Born
8 Mar 185623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Mar 185624.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 188452.6AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
16 Nov 188452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
18 May 189462.1AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
5 Dec 191684.7DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Scotti
Bishop Giovanni Battista Scotti (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolsena, Diocese of Orvieto
Ordained BishopAugustins des 7 douleurs-Janicule, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134, and Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017