Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eliseo Giordano, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1820Born
24 Oct 183818.6ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
23 Mar 184424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Mar 188363.0AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
15 Apr 188363.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
7 Jan 190685.8DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eliseo Giordano
Bishop Eliseo Giordano O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Transpontina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017