Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Graniello, B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1834Born
6 Jun 185723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
8 Jan 189257.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
29 Mar 189258.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
3 Apr 189258.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
12 Jun 189359.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189359.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
8 Jan 189661.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Graniello (VIAF: 88720668)
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Graniello B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Clerics Regular of Saint Paul tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017