Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioachino Cantagalli

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1825Born
23 Sep 184823.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 187651.1AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
29 Oct 187651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
10 Nov 188459.2AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
27 Mar 188559.6InstalledBishop of Faenza, Italy
13 Aug 191286.9DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioachino Cantagalli (VIAF: 88858281)
Bishop Gioachino Cantagalli (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopServite Church, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 172, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017