Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Foschi

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1838Born
25 May 186122.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187738.7AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
15 Apr 187738.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
7 Oct 190870.2DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Foschi (VIAF: 90349091)
Bishop Federico Foschi (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartorano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017