Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Montuoro

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1810Born
15 Mar 183423.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 185948.9AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
26 Jun 185949.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
24 Mar 186251.7DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Montuoro
Bishop Giovanni Montuoro (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1862
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017