Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria Cappetta (Cappelta)

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1804Born
1828²23.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 185955.0SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
20 Jun 185955.1ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
26 Jun 185955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
22 Jul 187167.2DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Cappetta (Cappelta)
Bishop Alfonso Maria Cappetta (Cappelta) (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcerenza, Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017