Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz da Conceição Saraiva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1824Born
15 May 184217.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Apr 184722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Feb 186136.4SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
22 Jul 186136.8ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
20 Oct 186137.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
26 Apr 187651.5DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz da Conceição Saraiva (VIAF: 89439466)
Bishop Luiz da Conceição Saraiva O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Amaro, Diocese of São Salvador da Bahia
Error (2)Sao Bento, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017