Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Wuhu [Wuhu]

Dioecesis Uhuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Taikoo Matow, Wuhu, Anhui, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nganhoei
8 August 1921ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nganhoei (erected)
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Nganhoei
Vicariate Apostolic of Weihweifu
Vicariate Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu]
Vicariate Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Nganhoei
Vicariate Apostolic of Weihweifu
Vicariate Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu]
Diocese of Wuhu [Wuhu]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu] Diocese of Wuhu [Wuhu]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Wuhu [Wuhu]
195041,1355,000,000.8%85058709261524ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 16 Sep 2012