Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Huarte y San Martín, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu], China

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1877Born
189315.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
30 Jul 190831.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Apr 192245.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nganhoei, China
26 Apr 192245.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
24 Sep 192245.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
23 Aug 193558.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu], China

MicroData Summary for Vicente Huarte y San Martín
Bishop Vicente Huarte y San Martín S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeiza, Spain

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017