Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Bili, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1835Born
1853¹17.9ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1859¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
19 Dec 187641.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China
19 Dec 187641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
22 Jul 187742.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
12 May 187843.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pascal Bili
Bishop Pascal Bili O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRicorboli, Italy

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017