Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessio Maria Filippi, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Paneade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1818Born
23 Oct 183718.8ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1841¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
Aug 1870³51.6AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
25 Jan 187657.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
25 Jan 187657.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paneade
22 Nov 1888³69.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessio Maria Filippi
Bishop Alessio Maria Filippi O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena, Italy

  • a priest for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017