Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Lei Shiyin (Chiyin)

Bishop of Leshan [Kiating], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1963¹ Born
30 Nov 199128.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 201047.2SelectedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
29 Jun 201148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
22 Sep 201855.7ConfirmedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Lei Shiyin (Chiyin)
Bishop Paul Lei Shiyin (Chiyin) (born 1963) Bishop of Leshan [Kiating]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHoly Rosary, Church, Emeishan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Leshan [Kiating].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast