Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Matthew Pan Deshi] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1924Born
1950²25.2Ordained PriestPriest
1991²66.2SelectedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
8 Dec 199167.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
3 Dec 200581.1DiedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Pan Deshi
Bishop Matthew Pan Deshi (born , died ) Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGucheng/Dingxing County
Ordained BishopTangshan, Diocese of Yongping [YŁngping]

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast