Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ma Cunguo

Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Shuozhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1971 Born
23 Mar 199625.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 200433.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China
15 Mar 200736.1SucceededBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Ma Cunguo
Bishop Paul Ma Cunguo (born ) Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShouzhou, Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast