Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Liu Genzhu

Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1966 Born
22 Dec 199125.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 202054.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hongdong [Hungtung], China

MicroData Summary for Pietro Liu Genzhu
Bishop Pietro Liu Genzhu (born ) Bishop of Hongdong [Hungtung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHongdong County, Diocese of Hongdong [Hungtung]
Ordained BishopCathedral, Hongdong, Diocese of Hongdong [Hungtung]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hongdong [Hungtung].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast