Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Ding Lingbin

Bishop of Changzhi [Luan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1962 Born
16 Nov 199230.3Ordained PriestPriest of Changzhi [Luan], China
2013²50.4ConfirmedBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
10 Nov 201654.3Ordained BishopBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Ding Lingbin
Bishop Peter Ding Lingbin (born ) Bishop of Changzhi [Luan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuang nian town, Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]
Ordained BishopChangzhi, Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Changzhi [Luan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 1 Jan 2020

Quantcast