Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Alphonse Yang Guang Yan] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1928Born
24 Sep 195527.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 199567.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China
4 Sep 200475.9DiedBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Yang Guang Yan
Bishop Alphonse Yang Guang Yan (born , died ) Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChowchich, Diocese of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]
Ordained BishopZhouzhi, Diocese of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast