Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Ma Qi (Ma Ji)

Deceased

Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1918Born
29 Jun 194728.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 198768.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China
11 Feb 199980.3DiedBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China

MicroData Summary for Philipp Ma Qi (Ma Ji)
Bishop Philipp Ma Qi (Ma Ji) (born , died ) Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang]

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast