Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Morel, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China

Titular Archbishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1880Born
189918.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Jul 190524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Mar 193857.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Suiyüan [Hohot], China
21 Mar 193857.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Araxa
18 Oct 193857.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Araxa
11 Apr 194665.4AppointedArchbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
19 Aug 195170.8ResignedArchbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
19 Aug 195170.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aenus
6 Jun 197190.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China

MicroData Summary for Louis Morel
Archbishop Louis Morel C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hohhot [Suiyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouthem-lès-Comines, Belgium

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017