Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan van Cauwelaert, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1914Born
6 Aug 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
6 Jan 195439.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jan 195439.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
25 Mar 195439.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
10 Nov 195945.5AppointedBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jun 196753.1ResignedBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jun 196753.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Uccula
12 Oct 197662.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Uccula
18 Aug 2016102.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jan van Cauwelaert (VIAF: 289437167)
Bishop Jan van Cauwelaert C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Inongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntwerpen, Belgium

  • a priest for 77.0 years
  • a bishop for 62.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Aug 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018