Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Fan Heng-nfan

Deceased

Bishop of Jining [Tsining]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1882BornSiwantze
24 Sep 191027.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 193350.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tsining [Jining], China
10 Jan 193350.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
11 Jun 193350.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
11 Apr 194663.5AppointedBishop of Jining [Tsining], China
1975²92.2DiedBishop of Jining [Tsining], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Fan Heng-nfan:
Bishop Joseph Fan Heng-nfan (born ) Bishop of Jining [Tsining]

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013