Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Salotti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Rites

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1870BornGrotte di Castro
22 Sep 189424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Orvieto, Italy
30 Jun 193059.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
3 Jul 193059.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
6 Jul 193059.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
13 Mar 193362.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 193565.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
16 Dec 193565.4Elevated to Cardinal
14 Sep 193868.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
11 Dec 193969.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
24 Oct 194777.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites

MicroData Summary for Carlo Salotti:
Cardinal Carlo Salotti (born , died ) Prefect of Rites

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013