Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rosi

Deceased

Bishop of Montefiascone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1872BornCamisano
27 Jan 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 191038.4AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
29 Jan 191138.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
5 Apr 195178.7DiedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rosi:
Bishop Giovanni Rosi (born , died ) Bishop of Montefiascone

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015