Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Wang Muduo (Wang Mu-to)

Deceased

Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1904Born
19 Dec 192925.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 194843.7AppointedBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
7 Mar 194843.9Ordained BishopBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
3 Oct 195955.5DiedBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Wang Muduo (Wang Mu-to)
Bishop Peter Wang Muduo (Wang Mu-to) (born , died ) Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa]

EventPlace
Death PlacePrison, Pafoi

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,907
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 16
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast