Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Conrad Abels, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1856BornWeert, Netherlands
29 Mar 187923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Jul 189741.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}, China
9 Jul 189741.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
31 Oct 189741.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
4 Feb 194286.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou], China

MicroData Summary for Conrad Abels:
Bishop Conrad Abels C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013