Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Janssens, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jinzhou [Jehol], China

Titular Bishop of Acarassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1876Born
189518.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Jul 190124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
7 Jul 192245.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}, China
7 Jul 192245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Faustinopolis
26 Nov 192246.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Faustinopolis
4 Feb 194265.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou], China
11 Apr 194669.4AppointedBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China
9 Jan 194871.2ResignedBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China
9 Jan 194871.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Acarassus
14 Apr 195073.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Jinzhou [Jehol], China

MicroData Summary for Louis Janssens
Bishop Louis Janssens C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jinzhou [Jehol]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStabroek, Belgium

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017