Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Liu Jingshan

Deceased

Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1913Born
26 Jun 194228.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 199278.7SelectedBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
1 Oct 199379.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
Dec 2009³96.1ResignedBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
4 Feb 201399.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Liu Jingshan
Bishop John Baptist Liu Jingshan (born , died ) Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenkou (Bameng)
Ordained BishopYinchuan, Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia]
Death PlaceYinchuan, Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,833
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c34: CB, 26 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast