Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Du Jiang

Bishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1963 Born
16 Jul 198925.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 200440.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]
8 Apr 201046.3InstalledBishop of [Shanba (Patriotic), China]

MicroData Summary for Matthias Du Jiang
Bishop Matthias Du Jiang (born ) Bishop of Shanba

EventPlace
Ordained Bishop(in secret), Bameng, [Patriotic Diocese of Shanba]

Please contact the Bishop through the [Patriotic Diocese of Shanba].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,614
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast