Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Meng Quinglu

Bishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1962 Born
16 Jul 198927.0Ordained PriestPriest
Jul 2005³43.0SelectedBishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
18 Apr 201047.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Meng Quinglu
Bishop Paul Meng Quinglu (born ) Bishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWumeng
Ordained BishopHohhot, Archdiocese of Hohhot [Suiyüan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hohhot [Suiyüan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast