Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Li Boyu (Li Pai-yu, Li Bao-yu)

Deceased

Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1908Born
9 Jul 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 195142.9AppointedBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China
5 Aug 195143.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China
7 Feb 198071.6DiedBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China

MicroData Summary for Louis Li Boyu (Li Pai-yu, Li Bao-yu)
Bishop Louis Li Boyu (Li Pai-yu, Li Bao-yu) (born , died ) Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWei-t'si-tzai, Prefecture Apostolic of Chowchich [Zhouzhi]
Death PlaceXian

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,688
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,910
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 76
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast