Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Andrew Liu An-zhi (Li Anchi)], C.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1895Born
1916²20.9EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
25 Jan 192126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Jan 196267.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China
1966¹70.9DiedBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Liu An-zhi (Li Anchi)
Bishop Andrew Liu An-zhi (Li Anchi) C.M. (born , died 1966) Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNantang, Cathedral, Peking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 39
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,085

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Dec 2019

Quantcast