Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Sun Zhi-bin (Sun Zhi Pin)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1911Born
17 Dec 193928.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 198877.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China
23 Oct 200897.5DiedBishop of Yiduxian [Iduhsien], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sun Zhi-bin (Sun Zhi Pin)
Bishop Joseph Sun Zhi-bin (Sun Zhi Pin) (born , died ) Bishop of Yiduxian [Iduhsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinqu county
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tsinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,113
  • bd/op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast