Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Li Xue-song] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jilin [Kirin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1904Born
1935¹30.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 1985³81.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China
20 May 199490.2DiedBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Li Xue-song
Bishop John Li Xue-song (born , died ) Bishop of Jilin [Kirin]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKirin, Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast