Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Paul Han Xi-rang], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1918Born
11 Apr 194930.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 198869.7Ordained BishopBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China
6 Mar 199273.5DiedBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Han Xi-rang
Bishop Paul Han Xi-rang O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tsinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,110
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,583
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,829
  • b/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast