Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Matthias Wu Guo-huan] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hangzhou [Hangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1892¹Born
2 Feb 195866.0SelectedBishop of Hangzhou [Hangchow], China
26 Apr 196068.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hangzhou [Hangchow], China
3 Jan 199098.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hangzhou [Hangchow], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Wu Guo-huan
Bishop Matthias Wu Guo-huan (born 1892, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hangzhou [Hangchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
Death PlaceMapeng

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast