Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Fang Zhigang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Wenzhou)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1958SelectedBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China
26 Apr 1960Ordained BishopBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China

MicroData Summary for Fang Zhigang
Bishop Fang Zhigang , Bishop Emeritus of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 26
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,079
  • sele: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast