Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Shen Chu-ming] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1958SelectedBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China
15 Nov 1959Ordained BishopBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China
1966¹DiedBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Shen Chu-ming
Bishop Shen Chu-ming (died 1966) Bishop of Suzhou [Soochow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNanking, Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast