Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Peter Zhao Zhendong (Zhao Bide)

Deceased

Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1920Born
14 Aug 194929.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 198969.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
12 Dec 199979.4SucceededBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
13 Jul 200786.9DiedBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China

MicroData Summary for Philip Peter Zhao Zhendong (Zhao Bide)
Bishop Philip Peter Zhao Zhendong (Zhao Bide) (born , died ) Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBaoding, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-Yüan]
Death PlaceXuanhua, Diocese of Xuanhua [Süanhwa]

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast