Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Su Zhimin

Deceased

Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1932³Born
12 Apr 1981³48.7Ordained PriestPriest
1988²55.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
2 May 199360.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
21 Dec 199563.4AppointedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Su Zhimin
Bishop James Su Zhimin (born ) Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2+: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast