Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Jin Yangke

Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1958³ Born
11 Nov 199032.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
2012¹54.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
28 Nov 201254.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
25 Sep 201759.7SucceededBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
18 Aug 202062.6InstalledBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Jin Yangke
Bishop Francis Xavier Jin Yangke (born Jan 1958) Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCixi, Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 19 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 20 Aug 2020

Quantcast