Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nathaniel Johann Heinrich Bürger, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Titular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1733Born
11 Jan 177743.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
11 Jan 177743.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
6 Jun 177845.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
20 Jul 177845.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
18 Oct 177845.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
22 Aug 178047.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

MicroData Summary for Nathaniel Johann Heinrich Bürger
Bishop Nathaniel Johann Heinrich Bürger O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKulmain, Germany
Ordained BishopSianfu
Death PlaceTaiyuan

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,778, Number 33
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Jan 2020

Quantcast