Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel de Jesus-Maria-Joseph, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1721AppointedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
30 Mar 1721Ordained BishopBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
6 Jul 1739DiedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel de Jesus-Maria-Joseph:
Bishop Emmanuel de Jesus-Maria-Joseph O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 24 Oct 2013